judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN E. ADAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0606
Short Caption:JOHN E. ADAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:81-CF-0606Consolidated: 81-CF-0620 , 82-CF-0824
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/21/1981

Opening Event Date:04/21/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/06/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/1983
Argued/Submitted:05/25/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn E. Adams N
David Carey WollNN
AppellantJohn Doe N
John P. RacinNN
AppellantJohn E. Adams, Jr.N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADAMS, JOHN E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 WOLLD VACATED RACINJ VACATED 8/19/86
04/21/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/06/1982FiledRecord Completed
03/23/1983FiledBriefing Completed
05/25/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition