judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRANDY DIANA LARGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-89)
Case Number:06-89Case Docketed On:04/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:BRANDY DIANA LARGE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRANDY DIANA LARGE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrandy Diana LargeDonna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
D. Terry Rogers
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey
Terry L. Armitage

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 22
Citation:177 P.3d 807

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/26/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/27/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/08/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/11/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
10/11/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
11/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/23/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/13/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/19/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/22/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
04/23/2007Order - Other - Emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument (Justice Golden ill).OrderOtherFinal
04/25/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/25/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/28/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/17/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/17/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/20/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/18/08 by B. Bridewell.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal