judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS TEXTILE MILLS, ET AL. v. CATHRYN SIKORSKI

Case: A-176
A-176
05/15/1944
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS TEXTILE MILLS, ET AL.
CATHRYN SIKORSKI
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/22/1944Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
06/08/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/19/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/18/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1944Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
06/08/1944Response to Motion filed
06/08/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/19/1944Reply to Response
05/18/1944Response to Petition
05/15/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/15/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Textile Mills, et al.Petitioner
Cathryn SikorskiRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information