Case: 14-01-00427-CR
14-01-00427-CR
04/25/2001
Robbery
Rocka, Angela
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/07/2003 | Case stored | | |||
12/06/2002 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/03/2002 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||
09/18/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | | ||
07/03/2002 | Record Sent | | |||
06/03/2002 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||
05/29/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |||
05/17/2002 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |||
05/02/2002 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||
04/11/2002 | Submitted | | |||
04/11/2002 | Submission | | |||
04/11/2002 | Submitted | | |||
02/08/2002 | Submission | | |||
02/01/2002 | State's brief DUE | | |||
01/29/2002 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
01/29/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/29/2002 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/07/2002 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
01/02/2002 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
12/20/2001 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | | ||
12/13/2001 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
12/13/2001 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | MOOT | | ||
11/09/2001 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
11/06/2001 | Past due brief | | |||
10/31/2001 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |||
10/03/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
10/01/2001 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
10/01/2001 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
09/20/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
09/19/2001 | No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED | | |||
09/06/2001 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | MOOT | | ||
08/28/2001 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |||
08/21/2001 | Extend time to file court reporter record DISPOSED | GRANTED | | ||
08/21/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
08/16/2001 | Extend time to file court reporter record FILED | | |||
08/06/2001 | No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED | | |||
07/30/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
07/16/2001 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |||
07/13/2001 | No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED | | |||
05/29/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
05/14/2001 | No Reporter's Record in Criminal case FILED | | |||
05/11/2001 | Docketing statement DUE | | |||
04/30/2001 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |||
04/27/2001 | Record due | | |||
04/27/2001 | Reporter's Record Due | | |||
04/26/2001 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |||
04/25/2001 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/26/2001 | Date of Sentence | | |||
02/26/2001 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/06/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Eric Kugler |
ROCKA, ANGELA | Criminal - Appellant | Ernest Davila |
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
867,828
60 yrs TDCJ