judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PICKETT (CARY) VS. STATE C/W 34184

Case Information: 34183
Short Caption:PICKETT (CARY) VS. STATE C/W 34184Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34183*, 34184
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143146Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/11/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-03774
07/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33788, 34009, 34179, 34183, 34184, 34268, 34269, 34297, 34304.
10/11/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 10/06/99. 99-09790
10/11/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR. Nos. 34183/34184. 01-10101
07/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10349
07/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 19, 2001. 01-10349