judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MILTON PROPERTIES INC. NEWBY, GERALDINE

Case Information: 82-CV-0051
Short Caption:MILTON PROPERTIES INC. NEWBY, GERALDINEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT85376-80Filed Date:01/08/1982

Opening Event Date:01/08/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/21/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/17/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Manuel Auerbach NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel R. White NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MILTON PROPERTIES INC. NEWBY, GERALDINE
01/08/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/21/1982FiledRecord Completed
06/17/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/12/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/27/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition