judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

POPE (ENDREL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32271
Short Caption:POPE (ENDREL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37815 , 38718 , 45339
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140374Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice BeckerPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/26/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/01/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 00-08999
05/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certifited copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32252, 32271, 32273, 32275, 32284, 32305, 32312, 32315.
10/26/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
10/26/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. If the transcript of the March 12, 1997 sentencing hearing has already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall within 10 days from the date of this order transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copyof the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has no already been prepared, we direct that the district court order the prompt preparation of the march 12, 1997 sentencing transcript. Upon completion of the transcript, the clerk of the district court shall within 10 days transmit to the celerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. 01-00972
01/26/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 12, 1997. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 01-01759
04/17/2001Order/Procedural Order. If the January 17, 1997 arraignment has already been prepared, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. If the transcript has not already been prepared, the district court shall order the prompt preparation of the transcript. Upon the completion and filing of the transcript in the district court, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the transcript as a supplemental record on appeal. 01-06551
04/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 17, 1997. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 01-06903
05/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 17, 1997. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson (received from district court clerk per 4/17/01 order). 01-07622
05/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 12, 1997. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. (Certified copy received from district court clerk.) 01-07824
05/23/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in the district court proceedings.
05/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-WM/CY/ML 01-09032
06/26/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-09033
06/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2001. 01-09033