judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEREK J. LONG, II v. CRAIG DALY; SUE DALY; and BNSF COMPANY, a Delaware corporation,

Case Heading (06-118)
Case Number:06-118Case Docketed On:05/31/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Agriculture, Livestock and Other Animals (Title 11)
Short Title:DEREK J. LONG, II v. CRAIG DALY; SUE DALY; and BNSF COMPANY, a Delaware corporation,
Full Title:DEREK J. LONG, II, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CRAIG DALY; SUE DALY; and BNSF COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, Appellee (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDerek J. Long IIFrank J. Jones
AppelleeCraig DalyPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeSue DalyPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeBNSF Railway Company, a Delaware corporationKay Lynn Bestol
Paul Kapp

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 69
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/13/2006Event - Oral argument presentedEventOral argument presentedFinal
05/31/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/31/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/31/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/10/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/10/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/21/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/29/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/13/2006Brief - Appellee BNSF RailwayBriefAppelleeFinal
11/14/2006Brief - Appellee Craig Daly and Sue DalyBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/11/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I - II, Original Papers and TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/11/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frank J. Jones for appellant and Kay Lynn Bestol and Patrick J. Murphy for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
04/27/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/15/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/15/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal