judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MURPHY, TIMOTHY L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0493
Short Caption:MURPHY, TIMOTHY L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4290-79Filed Date:12/10/1980

Opening Event Date:12/10/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/05/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/22/1982
Argued/Submitted:04/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURPHY, TIMOTHY L. UNITED STATES
12/10/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/05/1982FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1982FiledBriefing Completed
04/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/19/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition