Case Information: 34174 | |||
Short Caption: | AYALAS, INC. VS. DISTRICT COURT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 36934 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A340501 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/10/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/10/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. | 99-03740 | |
05/11/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. The prescribed $200 filing fee. Due Date: 10 days. | 99-03777 | |
05/14/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Netzorg & Cashette--check no. 6955. | ||
06/09/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. | 99-04907 | |
06/30/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. mailed on 6/29/99 (FedEx). | 99-05731 | |
07/12/1999 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Errata to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 99-06215 | |
01/06/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-00206 | |
01/06/2000 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to John M. Netzorg for service upon Judge Michael L. Douglas. | 00-00222 | |
01/18/2000 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Douglas on January 10, 2000. | 00-00222 | |
01/24/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 1/20/00). | 00-01140 | |
02/16/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-02451 | |
02/24/2000 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: 2/23/00 (FedEx). | 00-02949 | |
03/03/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-03408 | |
03/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/29/2000 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. Order Denying Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. On February 24, 2000, Bayer filed a petition for en banc reconsideration. We have reviewed the petition, and we conclude that en ban reconsideration is not warranted. We deny the petition. EN BANC | 00-05031 |