Case Information: 34173 | |||
Short Caption: | SMELTZER VS. EICON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A390098 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/17/1999 / Brown, Janice | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 09/11/2000 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Las Vegas Office |
Submission Date: | 09/11/2000 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/10/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert G. Giunta--check no. 3762. | ||
05/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-03727 | |
05/17/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janice J. Brown. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
05/21/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-04208 | |
06/17/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-05258 | |
07/09/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Schedule. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 99-06088 | |
07/19/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant's Certification Regarding District Court Transcript. | 99-06440 | |
10/18/1999 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/14/99. | 99-10105 | |
10/18/1999 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 99-10106 | |
11/08/1999 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 11/4/99. | 99-10980 | |
12/06/1999 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 4, 2000. | 99-12234 | |
01/03/2000 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/29/99. | 00-00067 | |
07/28/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 11, 2000 at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-CY/WM/NB) | 00-13125 | |
08/29/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 00-15140 | |
09/11/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Panel: SNP00A-CY/WM/NB. | ||
12/07/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's order and remand this case to the district court . . . on remand, the district court shall remand the matter to the appeals officer for a determination of whether Smeltzer's heart attack was caused by an accident at work." fn4[We remand this case so that the appeals officer may reexamine the possibility that there is a causal relationship between the work incident and Smeltzer's heart attack.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB | 00-21414 | |
12/28/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Publication of Order. | 00-22630 | |
01/03/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-21535 | |
01/03/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/04/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Publication and, in the Alternative, Motion to Enlarge Time for Petition for Rehearing. | 01-00198 | |
02/20/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. | 00-21535 | |
02/26/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Publish. Publication of the order would be of little or no precedential value. We therefore deny the motion for publication. Fn3[We also deny respondent's motion to enlarge the time for filing a petition for rehearing shuld we be inclinded to publish our order; the motion is moot. Young, J. and Becker, J. Maupin, C.J., dissenting. SNP00A-CY/WM/NB | 01-03495 |