judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10152
A-10152
05/04/1964
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHERN NECHES CORPORATION, ET AL.
SINCLAIR OIL AND GAS COMPANY AND ATLANTIC REFINING COMPANY, PRITCHARD AND ABBOTT, WARREN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/05/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/27/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/04/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/27/1964Response to Motion filed
08/05/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/27/1964Response to Petition
05/25/1964Response to Petition
05/19/1964Motion to dismiss
05/19/1964Response to Petition
05/05/1964Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
05/04/1964Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southern Neches Corporation, et al.Petitioner
Pritchard and AbbottRespondent
Warren Independent School District, et al.Respondent
Sinclair Oil and Gas Company and Atlantic Refining CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information