judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WATSON, LAWRENCE UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-1619
Short Caption:WATSON, LAWRENCE UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Lead:82-CM-1619Consolidated: 83-CM-0066
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M22983-82Filed Date:12/20/1982

Opening Event Date:12/20/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/25/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/17/1983
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John J. Stanton NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WATSON, LAWRENCE UNITED STATES
12/20/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/25/1983FiledRecord Completed
06/17/1983FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition