Case: A-10159
A-10159
05/07/1964
Application for Writ of Error
GREAT AMERICAN RESERVE INSURANCE COMPANY
SAN ANTONIO PLUMBING SUPPLY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/06/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/21/1964 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
05/07/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
05/07/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/19/1965 | Letter Filed | | ||
05/06/1965 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/21/1965 | Opinion issued | | ||
07/15/1964 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/21/1964 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/07/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/07/1964 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/07/1964 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Great American Reserve Insurance Company | Petitioner | |
San Antonio Plumbing Supply Company | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information