Case Information: 84-CV-0832 | |||
Short Caption: | BROWN, JAMES C. COHEN, WILLIAM | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA14676-79 | Filed Date: | 06/20/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/20/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/14/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/21/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/17/1985 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | BROWN, JAMES C. ET AL COHEN, WILLIAM ET AL | |||
01/01/1906 | MESSITTEP for:GEORGE A. FULLER CO., INC. TRUITTS FOR (ALLEN J. LOCKMAN) | |||
06/20/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/14/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/21/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/17/1985 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/19/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |