judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10149
A-10149
05/04/1964
Application for Writ of Error
W. H. BULLARD, ET AL.
AUSTIN REAL ESTATE BOARD, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/17/1964Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/29/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/04/1964Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/15/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/04/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/17/1964Brief in Support of Petition
07/29/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/04/1964Reply to Response
05/15/1964Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
05/15/1964Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
05/15/1964Response to Petition
05/04/1964Miscellaneous letter
05/04/1964Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Austin Real Estate Board, Inc.Respondent
W. H. Bullard, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information