Case: 03-97-00836-CR
03-97-00836-CR
12/29/1997
Assault
Roland Lopez
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/13/2000 | CASE STORED | | |||||
06/07/1999 | Mandate Acknowledgment | | |||||
04/16/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |||||
12/08/1998 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/22/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
08/20/1998 | Submitted | | |||||
08/20/1998 | Submission | | |||||
07/30/1998 | Brief filed | | |||||
07/30/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/29/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
07/29/1998 | Submission | | |||||
07/13/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/23/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
06/22/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
06/12/1998 | Frivolous brief filed | | |||||
05/04/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/23/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
03/30/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/27/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||||
02/26/1998 | Exhibits filed | | |||||
02/26/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||||
02/25/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||||
01/02/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||||
12/29/1997 | Docketing statement received | | |||||
12/29/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/16/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Prosecuting Attorney | Interested party | The Honorable Matthew W. Paul |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Ronald Earle Mr. James Adkins |
Lopez, Roland | Appellant | Mr. Roland Lopez Ms. Linda Icenhauer-Ramirez |
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Thomas Blackwell
0971383
40 yrs. (HABITUAL)