Case: 09-97-00539-CV
09-97-00539-CV
12/29/1997
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Wood, Stephen Craig and Wood, Paula
California State Board of Equalization
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/11/1999 | Case stored | | |
10/11/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/07/1999 | order received from another court | | |
07/08/1999 | Petition for Writ | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/04/1999 | Petition for Writ | | |
04/19/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/19/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | | |
03/12/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/11/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | | |
02/11/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/31/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/27/1998 | Submitted | | |
11/27/1998 | Submission | | |
11/06/1998 | 21 Day Submission | | |
11/06/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
11/06/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/29/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/25/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
09/24/1998 | Order Entered | | |
08/25/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/24/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/16/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/16/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/16/1998 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
06/22/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
06/19/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/15/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/27/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/25/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/18/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/18/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/11/1998 | Letter | | |
01/27/1998 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
12/29/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
12/29/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/11/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
California State Board Of Equa | Appellee | George Spanos Herbert J Gilles |
Wood, Stephen Craig And Wo | Appellant | Robert N. Kennedy |
Trial Court Information
284th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Olen Underwood
96-09-02999-CV