Case: 12-00-00246-CR
12-00-00246-CR
08/23/2000
Capital Murder
Christina Martinez
State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/15/2010 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed | Pro Se | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/13/2011 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
01/12/2011 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
11/17/2010 | Record checked out | | |||
11/16/2010 | Fax received | | |||
11/16/2010 | Telephone call received | | |||
09/15/2010 | Petition for writ of habeas corpus filed | | |||
11/03/2004 | Clerk's Acknowlegement of Mandate | | |||
10/26/2004 | Case stored | | |||
10/26/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/15/2004 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||
10/08/2004 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||
09/15/2004 | Higher Court Decision | Refused | | ||
07/15/2004 | letter filed | | |||
06/14/2004 | ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT | | |||
06/08/2004 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
06/07/2004 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
06/03/2004 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |||
05/04/2004 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
04/19/2004 | motion for rehearing filed | | |||
04/15/2004 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||
03/31/2004 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
11/26/2003 | Submitted | | |||
11/05/2003 | Letter to Submit w/o Argument | | |||
03/13/2003 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/11/2003 | Case remanded from higher court | | |||
03/11/2003 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | | |||
03/10/2003 | Mandate issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
02/12/2003 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | | ||
08/27/2002 | Submission | | |||
08/27/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
08/15/2002 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/12/2002 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/12/2002 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/28/2002 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
02/14/2002 | motion for rehearing filed | | |||
01/30/2002 | Disposition of Motion | Overruled | | ||
01/29/2002 | ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT | | |||
01/23/2002 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |||
01/22/2002 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |||
01/22/2002 | Response to Motion Filed | | |||
01/18/2002 | motion filed | | |||
01/07/2002 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||
12/21/2001 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||
11/14/2001 | Submitted | | |||
09/28/2001 | Submission | | |||
08/01/2001 | Case ordered to mediation after briefs are filed | | |||
07/26/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
07/24/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |||
07/24/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
07/24/2001 | Brief Received | | |||
07/24/2001 | Motion for Leave to File Late Brief | | |||
06/25/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
06/15/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
05/04/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/01/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/30/2001 | Brief Filed | | |||
03/23/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/16/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/16/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/09/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
01/19/2001 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/10/2001 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/12/2000 | Reporters Record Filed | | |||
11/30/2000 | Mot ext time file record disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/20/2000 | Ext for Record Filed by trct clk, rept, or counsel | | |||
10/25/2000 | Mot ext time file record disp | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
10/19/2000 | Ext for Record Filed by trct clk, rept, or counsel | | |||
09/28/2000 | Notice of No Record Received | | |||
09/15/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |||
09/05/2000 | Docketing Statement | | |||
08/23/2000 | Notice for Criminal Docketing Statement | | |||
08/23/2000 | Notice of appeal received | | |||
08/16/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
06/28/2000 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |||
06/19/2000 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |||
05/22/2000 | Date Sentence Given in Open Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/26/2004 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
10/26/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Michael Sandlin |
Martinez, Christina | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Terrence W. Kirk |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Edward J. Marty |
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
Honorable Richard A. Bosworth
114-0245-00
Life/TDCJ-ID