Case Information: 84-CV-0889 | |||
Short Caption: | SHIEF, WENDELL SHIEF, GEORGIA | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D1064-84 | Filed Date: | 08/29/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/29/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/24/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/12/1985 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 07/15/1985 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SHIEF, WENDELL SHIEF, GEORGIA | |||
08/29/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/24/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/12/1985 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/15/1985 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/11/1985 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |