judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-10188
A-10188
05/21/1964
Application for Writ of Error
BILLY ROY HARBERGER
DON MARTIN, JACK MARTIN AND ELIZABETH SHADE, ET VIR, RAMON HOUSTON, ADMINISTRATOR, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/29/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/04/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1964Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/21/1964Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1964Response to Motion filed
10/29/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/04/1964Response to Petition
06/02/1964Response to Petition
05/25/1964Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/21/1964Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/21/1964Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ramon Houston, Administrator, et al.Respondent
Billy Roy HarbergerPetitioner
Don Martin, Jack Martin and Elizabeth Shade, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information