judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CUNNINGHAM (JERALD C.) VS. STATE C/W 32601,36001,36129

Case Information: 32234
Short Caption:CUNNINGHAM (JERALD C.) VS. STATE C/W 32601,36001,36129Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:32234*, 32601 , 36001 , 36129 Related Case(s): 32601 , 36001 , 36129 , 40139 , 46135
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - C48099Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/31/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/27/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
05/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Record On Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
08/31/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3 (Copies) (Received update copy of district court docket entries).
08/31/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/27/1999Other Other. Received Notice of Petition for En Banc Hearing of the Common Law President setting Appeal Court Case in Controversy that Still Exists as a matter of Law and Fact (Received the original only - received in case no. 32234 only; No. 32477 notice in Liew was filed 8/19/99).
02/26/1999Notice/IncomingReceived Notice. Proper Person Notice (Received the original only).
10/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. Appellant has repeatedly challenged the pre-trial proceedings. We caution appellant that a prisoner may forfeit all deductions of time earned by the prisoner if the court finds that the prisoner has filed a document in a civil action for an "improper purpose."] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB. Nos. 32234, 32601, 36001, 36129. 00-17992
11/21/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." SNP00A-WM/ML/NB Nos. 32234/32601/36001/36129 00-20486
01/02/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00006
01/02/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 3, 2000. 01-00006