judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GERALD SCHMIDT and CLAUDIA MELCHER v. KARL KILLMER, Trustee in Liquidation of Triple B Limited Partnership 1998B; MACY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, f/k/a MACY & McKEE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; TRIPLE B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 1998B, a Wyoming Limited Partnership; BRAMMER PETROLEUM, INC., a Texas Corporation doing business in Wyoming; CARPENTER & SONS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; BTS LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; SILVER PETROLEUM CORPORATION, an Oklahoma Corporation doing business in Wyoming; SUN CEMENTING OF WYOMING, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; KENNETH D. WAGNER (XS ENERGY, INC.); and WILLIAM R. BARTH, JR.

Case Heading (06-38)
Case Number:06-38Case Docketed On:02/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:GERALD SCHMIDT and CLAUDIA MELCHER v. KARL KILLMER, Trustee in Liquidation of Triple B Limited Partnership 1998B; MACY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, f/k/a MACY & McKEE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; TRIPLE B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 1998B, a Wyoming Limited Partnership; BRAMMER PETROLEUM, INC., a Texas Corporation doing business in Wyoming; CARPENTER & SONS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; BTS LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; SILVER PETROLEUM CORPORATION, an Oklahoma Corporation doing business in Wyoming; SUN CEMENTING OF WYOMING, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; KENNETH D. WAGNER (XS ENERGY, INC.); and WILLIAM R. BARTH, JR.
Full Title:GERALD SCHMIDT and CLAUDIA MELCHER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. KARL KILLMER, Trustee in Liquidation of Triple B Limited Partnership 1998B; MACY & ASSOCIATES, LLC, f/k/a MACY & McKEE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; TRIPLE B LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 1998B, a Wyoming Limited Partnership; BRAMMER PETROLEUM, INC., a Texas Corporation doing business in Wyoming; CARPENTER & SONS, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; BTS LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; SILVER PETROLEUM CORPORATION, an Oklahoma Corporation doing business in Wyoming; SUN CEMENTING OF WYOMING, INC., a Wyoming Corporation; KENNETH D. WAGNER (XS ENERGY, INC.); and WILLIAM R. BARTH, JR., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGerald SchmidtStuart S. Healy
AppellantClaudia MelcherStuart S. Healy
AppelleeKarl KillmerStephenson Dow Emery
AppelleeMacy & Associates, LLCStephenson Dow Emery
AppelleeBrammer Petroleum CorporationMorris R. Massey
AppelleeCarpenter & Sons, Inc.Morris R. Massey
AppelleeBTS LLCMorris R. Massey
AppelleeSilver Petroleum CorporationMorris R. Massey
AppelleeSun Cementing of Wyoming, Inc.Morris R. Massey
AppelleeKenneth D. WagnerMorris R. Massey
AppelleeWilliam R. Barth Jr.Morris R. Massey
AppelleeTriple B Limited Partnership 1998BStephenson Dow Emery

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities
Opinion Number:2009 WY 23
Citation:201 P.3d 1121

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/11/2006Brief - Appellants; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief. Stipulated motion for extension of time to file appellees' joint brief and extension of time for appellants to file reply brief. (no original signature of Stuart R. Healy)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of time. Order granting appellees' extension of time to file brief and order denying appellant's extension of time to file reply brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief. Second copy of stipulated motion for extension fo time to file appellees' joint brief and extension of time for appellants to file reply brief. (first motion for extension filed 4/16/06 didn't contain Stuart S. Healy's original signature, this one only has his)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief. Motion for extension of time to file appellees' joint brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/23/2006Order - Grant - extension of time to file briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/01/2006Brief - Appellee. Joint brief of appellees.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Designation of record. Received joint designation of parts of the record for transfer to the appellate court.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of joint brief of appellees on cd.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/14/2006Brief - Appellants' replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/22/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; volume V, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/21/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/13/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stuart S. Healy for appellants; Stephenson D. Emery and Morris R. Massey, arguments by Messrs. Emery and Massey for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/13/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/23/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/17/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal