judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOGAN, MARCUS G. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0428
Short Caption:LOGAN, MARCUS G. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2066-80Filed Date:03/20/1981

Opening Event Date:03/20/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/30/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/02/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Eugene M. Bond YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert B. Lyon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOGAN, MARCUS G. UNITED STATES
03/20/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/30/1982FiledRecord Completed
11/30/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/02/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/06/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition