judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ISLER, GARY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-1535
Short Caption:ISLER, GARY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M3729-82Filed Date:11/10/1982

Opening Event Date:11/10/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/25/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/11/1983
Argued/Submitted:10/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Douglas R. Sparks NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ISLER, GARY UNITED STATES
11/10/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/25/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1983FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/08/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition