Case Information: 34154 | |||
Short Caption: | ALVAREZ (JESUS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981458 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 99-03624 | |
05/10/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-03707 | |
05/27/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 99-04384 | |
05/27/1999 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 99-04385 | |
06/14/1999 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 99-05078 | |
07/09/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: ". . .we ORDER this appeal dismissed."-NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. | 99-06146 | |
08/03/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-07096 | |
08/03/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/11/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 1999. | 99-07096 |