judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELIEROY WALL T/A CASUALTY RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE

Case Information: 84-CV-0841
Short Caption:ELIEROY WALL T/A CASUALTY RECIPROCAL EXCHANGEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1349-83Filed Date:06/13/1984

Opening Event Date:06/13/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/24/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/14/1985
Argued/Submitted:04/25/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Othello G. JonesYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William A. Grant YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ELIEROY WALL T/A SUPERIOR BODY REBLDG & PAINT CASUALTY RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE
06/13/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/24/1984FiledRecord Completed
01/14/1985FiledBriefing Completed
04/25/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/05/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition