judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARLOW (HUGH) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34166
Short Caption:BARLOW (HUGH) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108749Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/08/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-03677
05/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34141, 34142, 34166, 34167. 99-04129
09/08/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. 99-08425
09/08/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-03387
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03753
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03753