judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUNT, MYRTA L. DENTAL CAPITAL CORPORATION

Case Information: 84-CV-0872
Short Caption:HUNT, MYRTA L. DENTAL CAPITAL CORPORATIONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1570-84Filed Date:05/29/1984

Opening Event Date:05/29/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/27/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/1984
Argued/Submitted:04/11/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James M. Fallon YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard M. Kind YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUNT, MYRTA L. ET AL DENTAL CAPITAL CORPORATION
05/29/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/27/1984FiledRecord Completed
12/28/1984FiledBriefing Completed
04/11/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/31/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition