Case: 14-90-00801-CV
14-90-00801-CV
09/11/1990
Miscellaneous civil
The City of Jersey Village
Texas No. 3, Ltd.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/11/1991 | Case stored | | |
07/09/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/09/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/24/1991 | No description available. | | |
05/23/1991 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
05/17/1991 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/02/1991 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/02/1991 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/24/1991 | Submitted | | |
04/24/1991 | Submission | | |
04/24/1991 | Submitted | | |
03/28/1991 | Submission | | |
01/17/1991 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | GRANTED | |
01/04/1991 | Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
12/14/1990 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/14/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/14/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/06/1990 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/21/1990 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/29/1990 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/29/1990 | No Statement of Facts FILED | | |
09/27/1990 | Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE | GRANTED | |
09/27/1990 | Transcript FILED | | |
09/11/1990 | Transcript received only; mtn. pending | | |
09/11/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/10/1990 | Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | David F. Beale |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Kenneth Wall |
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
88-62247