judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WALKER VS. BENNETT

Case Information: 32211
Short Caption:WALKER VS. BENNETTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9507498Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/30/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/27/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/22/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David Hamilton -- Check No. 5166. 00-08991
04/22/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.
04/30/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/15/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
09/28/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiciton. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
10/29/1998Other Other. Filed Response to Order to Determine Appealability.
12/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and server the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
04/06/1999Other Other. Filed Motion, Stipulation and Order that appellant may have to and including April 28, 1999, within which to file the opening brief.
04/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request)
04/26/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before May 28, 1999.
05/28/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 5/28/99
05/28/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.
06/25/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 6/24/99
07/21/1999Other Other. Filed Stipulation and Order that appellant may have to and including July 28, 1999, within which to file the reply brief.
07/28/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Messenger 7/28/99
01/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
01/27/2000Other Other. Case stands submitted on the record and briefs this day.
01/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Supplement Respondent's Exhibits (SCR123), NRAP 31(d).
08/29/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent filed a motion to supplement his exhibits, and appellant did not file an opposition. We grant the motion to supplement respondent's exhibits. However, we express no opinion as to whether the documents may be properly considered by this court in this appeal. 00-15200
09/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order to Detach and file Supplemental Exhibits. On August 29, 2000, we granted respondent's motion to supplement his exhibits in this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and file the supplemental exhibits attached to respondent's motion. 00-15478
09/01/2000ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Supplemental exhibits. (Detached from the Respondent's Motion filed 02/03/00 and filed supplemental proposed Exhibit B and proposed Exhibit C.) 00-15481
12/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-22210
01/08/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from David Hamilton-check no. 7164.
01/08/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 1/8/00. 01-00413
02/23/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-03451
03/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03697
03/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 4, 2001. 01-03697