judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CALDWELL, LILLIE M., UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0427
Short Caption:CALDWELL, LILLIE M., UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5382-79Filed Date:01/31/1981

Opening Event Date:01/31/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/09/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/17/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CALDWELL, LILLIE M., a/k/a LILLIE M. GASAWAY UNITED STATES
01/31/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/09/1982FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/17/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/25/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition