judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

STATE NATIONAL BANK OF MARSHALL, IN LIQUIDATION v. W. D. TITTLE

Case: A-184
A-184
05/18/1944
Application for Writ of Error
STATE NATIONAL BANK OF MARSHALL, IN LIQUIDATION
W. D. TITTLE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/29/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/18/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/14/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/23/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/30/1944Errata FiledPetitioner
05/29/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/18/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/09/1945Letter Filed
04/23/1945Order from Lower Court filed
01/29/1945Motion for production of documents filedFiling granted
01/27/1945Bond
01/08/1945Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
11/29/1944Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
11/29/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/18/1944Response to Brief filed
10/14/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/02/1944Bond
09/27/1944Document received (See Remarks)
09/27/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/23/1944Reply to Response
05/30/1944Errata Filed
05/29/1944Response to Petition
05/18/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State National Bank of Marshall, in LiquidationPetitioner
W. D. TittleRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information