Case: 04-95-00325-CR
04-95-00325-CR
05/01/1995
Other Felony
Darren Fields
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
05/01/1995
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/27/1996 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
09/27/1996 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
09/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/10/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/10/1996 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/11/1996 | Submitted | | |
06/11/1996 | Submission | | |
06/11/1996 | Submitted | | |
05/15/1996 | Submission | | |
04/22/1996 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
04/22/1996 | Brief Filed | | |
04/22/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/22/1996 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/10/1996 | Order Entered | | |
04/08/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/04/1996 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
04/04/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/27/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
02/22/1996 | Continuation of Information from previous event | | |
02/22/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
01/08/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion Granted in Part | |
01/08/1996 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
12/06/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
12/06/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
12/06/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
11/13/1995 | Order Entered | | |
11/13/1995 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/03/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
11/03/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
10/20/1995 | 10 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed | | |
09/14/1995 | Motion to Supplement Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/21/1995 | Motion to Supplement Record Filed | | |
08/07/1995 | 10 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed | | |
07/17/1995 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/29/1995 | Motion Filed | | |
05/16/1995 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/04/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
05/04/1995 | Order Entered | | |
05/01/1995 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
05/01/1995 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
04/18/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
04/07/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
03/24/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
01/18/1995 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
01/18/1995 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/20/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Lisa L. Braxton |
Darren Fields | Criminal - Appellant | Etta Mullin |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F87-96663-TI
10 yrs TDC (prob rev)