Case: 94-0275
94-0275
03/21/1994
Direct Appeal
ALVIS LEE BROOKS
CAMBIO PROPERTIES INC. AND LAWNMONT APARTMENTS
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/28/1994 | Reply to Response | Appellee in case | "Appellee's Objection to Direct Appeal to the Supreme Court" on behalf of Lawnmont Apartments | |
03/21/1994 | Direct Appeal filed | Appellant in case | | |
03/21/1994 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | Appellant in case | "Petition" filed in District Court | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/07/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/26/1994 | Case Stored | No Mo/Re filed | | |
05/26/1994 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | Orig of Ex (Petition in District Court), 1 copy of Paupers Aff to Lib | | |
05/03/1994 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | mail to Alvis Lee Brooks at 209 W. 9th, Austin, returned "attempted/not known" | | |
04/20/1994 | Direct Appeal disposed | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction | | |
03/28/1994 | Reply to Response | "Appellee's Objection to Direct Appeal to the Supreme Court" on behalf of Lawnmont Apartments | | |
03/21/1994 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | | | |
03/21/1994 | Direct Appeal filed | | | |
03/21/1994 | Exhibits in case/cause filed | "Petition" filed in District Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BROOKS, ALVIS LEE | Appellant | Mr. Alvis Lee Brooks (McDaniel) |
CAMBIO PROPERTIES | Appellee | Ms. Wanda Harkness |
LAWNMONT APARTMENTS | Appellee | Mr. Sean E. Breen Ms. Wanda Harkness |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
93-12033