judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Williams Industries, Inc. & John F. Beasley Construction Co. v. Eugene F. Pribyla & Karen J. Pribyla

Case: 05-94-00471-CV
05-94-00471-CV
03/18/1994
Contract
Williams Industries, Inc. & John F. Beasley Construction Co.
Eugene F. Pribyla & Karen J. Pribyla
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/20/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/18/1994Exhibits Filed
04/18/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/18/1994Transcript Filed
03/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/17/1994Appeal Bond Filed
02/16/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Anne Ashby
91-12846-G