Case: 07-94-00072-CR
07-94-00072-CR
03/18/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Fuentes, Leopoldo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/13/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/25/1995 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
06/28/1995 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
06/23/1995 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed | | |
05/24/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/17/1995 | Submitted | | |
04/17/1995 | Submission | | |
03/17/1995 | Submission | | |
03/01/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
03/01/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/01/1995 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | Motion Mooted | |
01/27/1995 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
12/27/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
12/23/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
11/28/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
10/31/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
10/28/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/10/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
10/05/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
10/05/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/30/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disp. | GRANT | |
09/23/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/19/1994 | Do not use | | |
06/23/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | GRANT | |
06/22/1994 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
05/26/1994 | Do not use | | |
03/18/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/13/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Honorable Dan Mike Bird |
Fuentes, Leopoldo | Criminal - Appellant | Robert Estrada |
Trial Court Information
46th District Court
Wilbarger
Honorable Thomas Allen Neely
9124
30 yrs, TDC