Case: 10-94-00044-CV
10-94-00044-CV
03/18/1994
Divorce
Linda Joyce Smith
Carroll Dean Smith
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/02/2002 | Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk. | | |
04/01/1996 | Case stored | | |
04/01/1996 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
03/11/1996 | Case returned from higher court | | |
02/15/1996 | Motion for Rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
01/18/1996 | (NO ACK) Writ disposed. | Motion or Writ Denied | |
09/13/1995 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
08/23/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
07/19/1995 | Motion for Rehearing filed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/26/1995 | Motion for Rehearing filed | | |
06/07/1995 | Opinion issued | Modified/Reformed and Affirmed | |
03/13/1995 | Post-Submission Letter Brief filed | | |
03/03/1995 | Post-Submission Letter Brief filed | | |
02/22/1995 | Submitted | | |
02/22/1995 | Submission | | |
12/28/1994 | Submission | | |
12/20/1994 | Submission | | |
10/12/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/05/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/05/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
10/05/1994 | Brief received, not filed | | |
09/28/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
09/06/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
08/17/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/04/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | | |
07/05/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
06/15/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/06/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
05/11/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/09/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/28/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
04/20/1994 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/04/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/23/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/18/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/03/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Smith, Carroll Dean | Appellee | William A. Dudley Charles R. Hodges |
Smith, Linda Joyce | Appellant | Richard R. Orsinger |
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
Honorable Gene Knize
50116-D