judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAPETAN (DANIEL) VS. STATE C/W 36202

Case Information: 36201
Short Caption:KAPETAN (DANIEL) VS. STATE C/W 36202Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:36201*, 36202
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P2099Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/31/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-09185
06/05/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 00-09422
06/14/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-10121
06/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-10122
06/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 36201 and 36202. Doc. No. 00-11114 00-11114
06/29/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-11143
07/27/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. fn1[On June 29, 2000, appellant's counsel filed a motion to consolidate these appeals for disposition pursuant to NRAP 3(b). The motion is granted and these appeals are consolidated.] "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. Nos. 36201, 36202. 00-13068
08/22/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13649
08/22/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13649