judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBARA REYNOLDS and LAURRIE REYNOLDS v. JOHN A. MILATZO and DIANA R. MILATZO

Case Heading (06-217)
Case Number:06-217Case Docketed On:09/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:BARBARA REYNOLDS and LAURRIE REYNOLDS v. JOHN A. MILATZO and DIANA R. MILATZO
Full Title:BARBARA REYNOLDS and LAURRIE REYNOLDS, Appellants (Plaintiff), v. JOHN A. MILATZO and DIANA R. MILATZO, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBarbara ReynoldsLisa M. Barrett-Oliver
AppellantLaurrie ReynoldsLisa M. Barrett-Oliver
AppelleeJohn A. MilatzoSteven F. Freudenthal
AppelleeDiana R. MilatzoSteven F. Freudenthal

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 104
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/25/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/09/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/22/2006Brief - Appellees; received copy of brief on disk and copy of appellees' designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2006Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/09/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
01/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes: Volumes I and II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/30/2007Order - Assignment of judge - recusing Justice Burke and assigning Nancy Guthrie, District Judge.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/29/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/17/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/17/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/17/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/20/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/18/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal