judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FORNAH, ELDRED M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0736
Short Caption:FORNAH, ELDRED M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2173-80Filed Date:05/22/1981

Opening Event Date:05/22/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/08/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/13/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Henry W. AsbillNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FORNAH, ELDRED M. UNITED STATES
05/22/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/08/1982FiledRecord Completed
07/19/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/04/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition