judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPAY v. FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF LIBERTY, TEXAS

Case: A-164
A-164
05/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPAY
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF LIBERTY, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/09/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/06/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/04/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/19/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/15/1944Additional Copies receivedOverruled
11/09/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/06/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1944Brief on the Merits
09/27/1944Submission reset
08/16/1944Letter Filed
05/24/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/19/1944Response to Petition
05/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
First National Bank of Liberty, TexasRespondent
Trinity Universal Insurance CompayPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information