judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Napier, Paul Dean v. The State of Texas

Case: 09-94-00121-CR
09-94-00121-CR
03/18/1994
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Napier, Paul Dean
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1995MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
01/09/1995Mandate Issued
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/13/1994Case ready to be set
09/13/1994Submitted
09/13/1994Brief Filed
09/13/1994Submission
08/18/1994Order Entered
08/12/1994Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
07/15/1994Brief Filed
07/15/1994Brief received, not filed
07/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/07/1994Order Entered
06/21/1994notification that brief of ant not filed
06/02/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/05/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/28/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/28/1994Statement of Facts Received
04/14/1994Transcript Filed
03/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Keeshan, James H.District or County JudgeHonorable James H. Keeshan
Napier, Paul DeanAppellantPeter Speers, III
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDaniel C. Rice
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
93-06-0595
40 years TDJC