Case: 14-94-00269-CR
14-94-00269-CR
03/21/1994
Capital Murder
Wilson, III, John
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/19/1998 | Motion to Obtain Record DISPOSED - APP, PRO SE | DENIED | |
02/09/1998 | Motion to Obtain Record FILED - APP, PRO SE | | |
05/31/1996 | Case stored | | |
05/20/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
05/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/20/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/19/1996 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
04/04/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/04/1996 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
03/13/1996 | Submitted | | |
03/13/1996 | Submission | | |
03/13/1996 | Submitted | | |
02/12/1996 | Submission | | |
01/26/1995 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/26/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/26/1995 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
01/26/1995 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/23/1995 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
01/23/1995 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
01/20/1995 | State's brief DUE | | |
12/29/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
12/19/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
12/19/1994 | State's brief DUE | | |
12/08/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
11/28/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/28/1994 | State's brief DUE | | |
10/31/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/06/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/27/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
09/01/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/21/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
07/18/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
05/26/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
05/18/1994 | No description available. | | |
05/17/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
05/17/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/18/1994 | Date of Sentence | | |
03/18/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/04/2017 | Case Stored | Case archived |
05/20/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Lester Blizzard |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Will Gray |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable LLOYD DOUGLAS SHAVER
659045
Life