Case: 14-94-00268-CR
14-94-00268-CR
03/21/1994
Other Drug Possession
Overshown, Emele Orlando
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/23/1996 | Case stored | | |
01/08/1996 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
01/08/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/08/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/23/1995 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
12/22/1995 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
12/07/1995 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
12/07/1995 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
11/22/1995 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
11/22/1995 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
11/20/1995 | Submitted | | |
11/20/1995 | Submission | | |
11/20/1995 | Submitted | | |
10/27/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/27/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/27/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/06/1994 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/06/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/27/1994 | Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA, | | |
09/26/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/25/1994 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
08/25/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
08/25/1994 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
08/16/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
08/15/1994 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/22/1994 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
07/19/1994 | No description available. | | |
06/16/1994 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
05/16/1994 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
05/13/1994 | Transcript FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
03/16/1994 | Date of Sentence | | |
03/16/1994 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/08/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
02/07/2023 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - Appellant | Arthur C. Washington |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas | Mary Lou Keel |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
679014