Case: 12-94-00079-CV
12-94-00079-CV
03/18/1994
Prohibition
Chappell, William
Tunnell, Judge Joe
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/18/2006 | Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action | | |
06/13/1994 | Case stored | | |
05/31/1994 | | ||
05/16/1994 | | ||
04/28/1994 | Motion for Leave to File Disposed | Overruled | |
04/28/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
04/28/1994 | Order Entered | Otherwise Disposed | |
04/28/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/28/1994 | Submission | | |
04/28/1994 | Submitted | | |
04/08/1994 | Order Entered | | |
04/08/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
03/31/1994 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
03/21/1994 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
03/21/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/21/1994 | Notice of judgment or order entered by Court | | |
03/21/1994 | Order Entered | | |
03/18/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
03/18/1994 | Brief Received | | |
03/18/1994 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/18/2006 | Case Destroyed | Case Destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Chappell, William | Relator | Mr. George Conner III |
Chappell, Verna | Respondent | Mr. Gary D. Jackson |
Tunnell, Judge, Joe | Respondent | Hon. Joe Tunnell |
Trial Court Information
321st District Court
Smith
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
92-1918-D