Case: 13-94-00141-CR
13-94-00141-CR
03/18/1994
Other Drug Possession
Ochoa, Rodolfo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/22/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/12/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
05/12/1994 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Dismissed | |
05/12/1994 | Motion for leave to file Transcript DISPOSED | Dismissed | |
05/12/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/27/1994 | Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed | | |
04/22/1994 | request for documents | | |
03/28/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file statement | | |
03/28/1994 | Motion for leave to file transcript | | |
03/24/1994 | Green card in | | |
03/18/1994 | Letter sent to attorneys | | |
03/18/1994 | Affidavit Filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/18/1994 | Transcript Received | | |
03/18/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/22/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Luis V. Saenz |
Ochoa, Rodolfo | Appellant | Walter J. Pink |
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Menton Murray
91-CR-984-E
5 yrs TDCJ-ID/Prob 5 yrs