judyrecords
search tips
700 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Mouton, Reginal Gerard v. The State of Texas

Case: 14-94-00262-CR
14-94-00262-CR
03/18/1994
Unauth. Use of Motor Vehical
Mouton, Reginal Gerard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/17/1996Case stored
12/03/1996Mandate Issued
12/03/1996Mandate Issued
11/18/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
08/09/1996Petition for discretionary review due
08/09/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/08/1996Mandate due to be issued
07/29/1996Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
07/25/1996No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/24/1996Petition for discretionary review due
07/01/1996Extend time to file PDR DISPOSEDGRANTED
06/24/1996Petition for discretionary review due
06/07/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
05/23/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/23/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/03/1996Mandate due to be issued
01/09/1996Submitted
01/09/1996Submission
01/09/1996Submitted
12/07/1995Submission
11/06/1995State's brief DUE
10/27/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/27/1995Case ready to be set
10/27/1995Case ready to be set
09/28/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/25/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/05/1995Appellant's brief DUE
09/05/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/03/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAOVERRULED
08/03/1995Order Entered
07/26/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/10/1995Past due brief
07/07/1995Appellant's brief DUE
06/08/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/05/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/01/1995Past due brief
05/22/1995Appellant's brief DUE
04/27/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/21/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/08/1995Past due brief
03/03/1995Appellant's brief DUE
02/02/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/25/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/24/1995Past due brief
01/16/1995Appellant's brief DUE
12/15/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/15/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/09/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/09/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
10/27/1994Amended motion DISPOSEDGRANTED
10/27/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/25/1994Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA
10/17/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/29/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/19/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/13/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/25/1994No description available.
08/25/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
06/09/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/27/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/17/1994No description available.
05/16/1994Transcript FILED
03/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/16/1994Date of Sentence
03/09/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/2017Case StoredCase archived
12/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MOUTON, REGINAL GERARDCriminal - AppellantR. Scott Shearer
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasDavid P. Bosserman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantBill Howell
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
26,398
99 yrs. TDC