Case: PD-0323-94
PD-0323-94
03/21/1994
PDR Case Type
FAGAN, BOBBY GENE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/02/1994 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/18/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/25/1994 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/14/1994 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FAGAN, BOBBY GENE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Lawrence B. Mitchell |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-93-00182-CR
AFF 2-10-93
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable GERRY MEIER
F83-91412-HU