Case: PD-0319-94
PD-0319-94
03/21/1994
PDR Case Type
STATE OF TEXAS V. HAMLIN, KENNETH
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/01/1994 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/15/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
06/15/1994 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/25/1994 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | | |
03/21/1994 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/12/1994 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HAMLIN, KENNETH | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Marjorie A. Meyers |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John B. Holmes |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-93-00377-CR
AFF 1-20-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Donald K. Shipley
650919